Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Westlake Services Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alexandryan, Edit, against Morales, Yvonne, Romero, Johnny, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 08/05/2022 08:15:00 AM. | |
August 05, 2022 | |||
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Morales, Yvonne on Complaint. | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Westlake Services LLC on 08/04/2022. | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Adrineh Minassian in Response to OSC Re: Failure to File Proof of Service/Default) filed by Westlake Services LLC on 08/04/2022. | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Romero, Johnny on Complaint. | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Westlake Services LLC on 08/04/2022. | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (Published June 02, 2022, June 09, 2022, June 16, 2022 and June 23, 2022) filed by Westlake Services LLC on 06/27/2022. | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 05/06/2022 08:15:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.