Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cross America Financial Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alexander, Steven K., against Rocha, Paul Anthony, Navarro Rocha, Lisa R, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2020 | |||
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 02/27/2020. | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Cross America Financial LLC on 02/13/2020. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Navarro Rocha, Lisa R on Complaint. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by Cross America Financial LLC on 02/13/2020. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (of Steven K Alexander RE Submission of Assignment and Statement of Account; Interest and Attorney Fees) filed by Cross America Financial LLC on 02/13/2020. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for Cross America Financial LLC against Navarro Rocha, Lisa R ;Rocha, Paul Anthony in the amount of: 5939.38 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 398.79 costs, 1725.30 pre-judgment interest, and 1190.90 attorney fees entered on 02/13/2020. | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Rocha, Paul Anthony on Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.