Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hale, Odell Iii, filed a(n) Civil Rights case against Marina Dental, Johnson Dds, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2020 | |||
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/08/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Hale, Odell III Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Hale, Odell III on 11/04/2019. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hale, Odell III on 11/04/2019. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 42. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Whole) filed by Hale, Odell III on 11/04/2019. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Hale, Odell III on 11/04/2019. Filed By: Hale, Odell III(Plaintiff) Refers To: Johnson DDS, Keith(Defendant) | Marina Dental(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.