Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Haugan, Jevne Clinton filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal (Final with attachments) filed by Haugan, Jevne Clinton on 02/10/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Notification to Department of Health Care Services) filed by Haugan, Jevne Clinton on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling (RE Order Appointing Administrator) filed by Haugan, Jevne Clinton on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters (Issued To Jevne Clinton Haugan) filed by Haugan, Jevne Clinton on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter issued on 12/19/2019. | |
December 18, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Grant. Appoint Petitioner Jevne Clinton Haugan as the administrator of the estate, with full IAEA powers. All heirs waive bond.
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
December 18, 2019 | |||
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Gose, Gregory R. appointed as Probate Referee . | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver of Notice (Waiver of Notice By Rod Pelzel) filed by Haugan, Jevne Scott on 12/18/2019. | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | The Court appoints Jevne Haugan as Administrator with will annexed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.