Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Viveros, Jacqueline, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 |
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Viveros, Jacqueline on 12/20/2019. | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (11/7/19, 11/14/19, 11/21/19, 11/28/19) filed by Viveros, Jacqueline on 12/02/2019. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Viveros, Jacqueline on 11/04/2019. Filed By: Viveros, Jacqueline(Petitioner) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Viveros, Jacqueline on 11/04/2019. | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Viveros, Jacqueline on 11/04/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.