Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrade, Chris, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard, David A, against Smith, Helen Rosetta, represented by Schmeckpeper, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Time To Trial153 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | (5 day time estimate) | ||
January 11, 2022 | |||
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Andrade, Chris on 11/03/2021. | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (5 day time estimate) scheduled for 02/14/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 43 was vacated. | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated. | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Completion Date 11/20/21) filed by Andrade, Chris on 09/20/2021. | |
May 17, 2021 |
(5 day time estimate)
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
||
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in 22 at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.