Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jung, Hyo Jin Julia, against Garcia, Jovita, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | |||
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC on 04/02/2019. | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC on 02/28/2019. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Jovita(Defendant) | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 02/28/2019. | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 02/28/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.