Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Coby Morales On Behalf Of Other Members Of The General Public Similarly Situated, Morales, Coby, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Pike, Bevin Allen, against Mcdonalds Usa Llc, Paschen Management Corporation, represented by Pickett, Ashley Farrell, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Carole Thompson on Behalf of CPT Group Inc, The Settlement Administrator, Re: Distribution of Settlement Funds) filed by Morales, Coby; Coby Morales on Behalf of Other Members of the General Public Similarly Situated on 05/28/2021. | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated (after 12/08/20 hearingin accordance with joint stipulation of class action settlement and release) filed by Coby Morales on Behalf of Other Members of the General Public Similarly Situated on 01/14/2021. | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for Coby Morales on Behalf of Other Members of the General Public Similarly Situated;Morales, Coby against McDonalds USA LLC;Paschen Management Corporation in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 01/14/2021. see 01/14/21 Judgment after hearing re Class Action Settlement and Release | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting (Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses and a class representative enhancement payment) filed by Coby Morales on Behalf of Other Members of the General Public Similarly Situated on 01/14/2021. | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
December 08, 2020 |
Re: Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement & Motion for Attorney Fees
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (CLM) heard 12/08/2020 09:30:00 AM. | |
December 03, 2020 |
Re: Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement & Motion for Attorney Fees
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Carole Thompson on Behalf of CPT the Settlement Administrator) filed by Coby Morales on Behalf of Other Members of the General Public Similarly Situated; Morales, Coby on 10/30/2020. | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 10/30/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.