Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
De Gomez, Silvestre Hernandez filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Conservatorship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Due 3/15/24 | ||
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Conservatorship Status Report) filed by Luna, Esteban Gomez; De Gomez, Silvestre Hernandez on 04/15/2022. | |
April 12, 2022 | Due 03/15/22 | ||
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 3/15/24 scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 3/15/24 is scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by Luna, Esteban Gomez; De Gomez, Silvestre Hernandez on 04/11/2022. | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
April 14, 2020 | Due 03/16/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.