Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carpenter, Randall M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stubblefield, Robert D., against Galleher Corporation, Carpenter, Randall M, Hudson Insurance Company, C W Johnson And Sons Inc, represented by Friedlander, Daniel A., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions363 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | |||
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith. | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated. | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Carpenter, Randall M on 08/02/2022. | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Completion Date October 1, 2022) filed by Carpenter, Randall M on 07/13/2022. | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference heard 06/08/2022 10:00:00 AM. | |
June 08, 2022 | |||
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Mandatory Settlement Conference Procedures; Acknowledgement of Receipt and Stipulation filed by Carpenter, Randall M on 06/07/2022. | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from C W Johnson and Sons Inc; Johnson, Charles William; Hudson Insurance Company on 06/07/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.