Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Reyna, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Levy, Jeremy J, against Lazer Broadcasting Corporation, Ayala, Jose, represented by Ramirez, Gregory J., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | (5 day) | ||
July 11, 2022 | (5 days) (Trial Call) | ||
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Jury Trial (LC) heard 07/11/2022 01:30:00 PM. | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference (CCM) - scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura. | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (5 day) scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura. | |
March 07, 2022 | (5 days) (Trial Call) | ||
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (to Continue trial . Trial continued until to July 11 2022 at 1:30pm in CR 21) filed by Gonzalez, Reyna on 03/01/2022. | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (5 days) (Trial Call) scheduled for 07/11/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 at Ventura. | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel (from 02/24/22 through 03/01/22) filed by Lazer Broadcasting Corporation on 02/17/2022. | |
February 07, 2022 | Re: Trial Call (5 day J/T) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.