Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bunggay, Bernard, Bunggay, Brian, Bunggay, Darlene, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Diaz, Manuel J., against Bunggay, Bernard, Bunggay, Darlene, City Of Camarillo, County Of Ventura, Mcknight, Steven Thomas, (total of 5) See All represented by Burge, Darren G, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2015 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Time To Trial151 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time329 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2016 | 7 day jury trial | ||
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (of all Parties and all Causes of Action) filed by Bunggay, Bernard; Bunggay, Brian; Bunggay, Darlene on 08/18/2016. | |
July 26, 2016 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 07/26/2016 at 10:30:00 AM in 22 was vacated. | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Bunggay, Bernard; Bunggay, Brian on 07/13/2016. | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - 7 day jury trial scheduled for 08/29/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated. | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Lingl, James P appointed as Mediator . | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by Bunggay, Bernard; Bunggay, Brian; Bunggay, Darlene on 02/24/2016. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.