Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank Trust Na As Trustee For Lsf9 Master Participation Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman, Randall D, against Sedgwick, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions19 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1284 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust on 08/20/2015. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; by serving Adam Sedgwick and by posting and mailing) filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust on 06/23/2015. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession) filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust on 06/23/2015. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession (and Declaration) filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust on 06/23/2015. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/23/2015. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Sedgwick, Adam on Complaint. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by US Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust on 06/23/2015. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.