Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Torres, Guadalupe Cano, Gonzalez, Kelly Lee, Gonzalez, Bradley Lee, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2014 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time264 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
September 15, 2014 | |||
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Gonzalez, Bradley Lee; Gonzalez, Kelly Lee; Torres, Guadalupe Cano on 09/15/2014. | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (August 1,8,15,22, 2014) filed by Gonzalez, Bradley Lee; Gonzalez, Kelly Lee; Torres, Guadalupe Cano on 08/22/2014. | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 09/15/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Gonzalez, Kelly Lee; Torres, Guadalupe Cano; Gonzalez, Bradley Lee on 07/28/2014. Filed By: Gonzalez, Kelly Lee(Petitioner) | Torres, Guadalupe Cano(Petitioner) | Gonzalez, Bradley Lee(Petitioner) | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Gonzalez, Kelly Lee; Torres, Guadalupe Cano; Gonzalez, Bradley Lee on 07/28/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.