Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2014 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time270 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
October 07, 2014 | |||
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Petition has been Granted. | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr on 10/07/2014. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Sept. 5, 12, 19, 26, 2014) filed by Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr on 09/30/2014. | |
September 03, 2014 | |||
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Petition (for Change of Name) filed by Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr on 08/26/2014. Filed By: Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr(Petitioner) | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name (Amended) filed by Enriquez, Calixto Rivera Jr on 08/26/2014. | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 10/07/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.