Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Scroggins, Thomas Henry, Scroggins, Deborah Luann, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2014 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time275 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
September 18, 2014 | |||
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name (Granted) filed by Scroggins, Deborah Luann; Scroggins, Thomas Henry on 09/18/2014. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication filed by Scroggins, Deborah Luann; Scroggins, Thomas Henry on 09/04/2014. | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 09/18/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Scroggins, Thomas Henry; Scroggins, Deborah Luann on 07/17/2014. Filed By: Scroggins, Thomas Henry(Petitioner) | Scroggins, Deborah Luann(Petitioner) | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scroggins, Thomas Henry; Scroggins, Deborah Luann on 07/17/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.