Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reyes, Irma Fraga, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2014 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time295 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
August 27, 2014 | |||
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name (Granted) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 08/27/2014. | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Tri County Sentry July 4,11,18 & 25) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 07/25/2014. | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 08/27/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014. | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Reyes, Irma Fraga on 06/27/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.