Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Motta, Fred, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2014 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 06/24/2015. | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (fully satisfied) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 04/29/2015. | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 10/07/2014. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 09/18/2014. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (of atty fees and costs/interest) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 09/18/2014. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 09/18/2014. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Motta, Fred on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc against Motta, Fred in the amount of: 1644.50 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 216.00 costs, 157.69 pre-judgment interest, and 378.90 attorney fees entered on 09/18/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.