Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Harris, Christy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time473 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (waiver of atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Harris, Christy in the amount of: 1961.86 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 236.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Harris, Christy on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served John Doe, co-resident) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/26/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.