Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Perez, Rafaela, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1181 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/11/2014. | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/20/2014. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/31/2013. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Perez, Rafaela(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.