Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Mcdonald, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 05/26/2015. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (waiver of atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against McDonald, Nathan in the amount of: 1600.58 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 236.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to McDonald, Nathan on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Alexander McDonald, sibling) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/27/2014. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.