Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kumar, Matthew J, against Velazquez, Miguel A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2351 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 06/08/2020. | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Interest Only $2,758.05) filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 07/10/2019. | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 07/10/2019. | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (NEW: Robert J Colclough OLD: Matthew J Kumar) filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 07/10/2019. | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 12/09/2014. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Statement - Other (of account) filed by Velazquez, Miguel A on 05/29/2014. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Velazquez, Miguel A on 05/29/2014. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 05/29/2014. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.