Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Valenzuela, Diane M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions514 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1620 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA on 06/08/2018. | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 07/24/2017. | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs: $195.00, Credit: $0.00, Interest: $234.34) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA on 07/24/2017. | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 08/26/2015. | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA on 05/29/2015. | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Re in support of Pltfs request for default and Vacating settlement) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA on 05/29/2015. | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment for Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA against Valenzuela, Diane M in the amount of: 530.93 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 535.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 132.73 attorney fees entered on 05/29/2015. | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA on 05/04/2015. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.