Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Orchard Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Stenmark, Beth M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1181 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA Orchard Bank on 04/28/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA Orchard Bank on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA Orchard Bank on 12/31/2013. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada NA Orchard Bank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Stenmark, Beth(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 21. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.