Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Mancera, Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions135 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time694 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 11/24/2015. | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Judgment - JUD100) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/14/2015. | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 05/13/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/14/2014. | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/14/2014. | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Mancera, Gabriela in the amount of: 3535.43 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 236.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 05/14/2014. | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/14/2014. | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.