Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Trujillo, Rene, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time505 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Judgment-JUD 100) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/19/2015. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Trujillo, Rene on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/08/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Clerks Judgment) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/08/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (waiver of atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/08/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Trujillo, Rene in the amount of: 1709.79 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 291.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/08/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/08/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/21/2014. | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/20/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.