Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Urbach, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions154 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time514 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 05/28/2015. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/02/2014. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Urbach, Michael E on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Urbach, Michael E in the amount of: 4454.47 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 236.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/02/2014. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (waiver of atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/02/2014. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/02/2014. | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/02/2014. | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/20/2014. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.