Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Delrio, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/11/2014. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 03/05/2014. | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/13/2014. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Delrio, Jeffrey(Defendant) | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.