Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Cuamatzi, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions170 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2370 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/26/2020. | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/03/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Cuamatzi, Pedro on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (waiver of atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Cuamatzi, Pedro in the amount of: 1764.05 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 236.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/18/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.