Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Garvin, Rodney, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions165 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/13/2014. | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 03/04/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 20. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.