Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brinkerhoff, Kristen L, against Ehrmann, David, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/11/2014. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 02/14/2014. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ehrmann, David(Defendant) | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.