Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nordstrom Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lee, Raymond J, against Zontag, Henrik, represented by Friedman, Todd M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions672 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time683 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Nordstrom FSB rejected on 11/10/2015. | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Nordstrom FSB on 11/02/2015. | |
October 30, 2015 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 10/30/2015 08:15:00 AM. | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 10/30/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
December 08, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.