Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Praxair Distribution Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Chow, Ronnie, against Hales Engineering Co Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions129 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1185 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC on 10/08/2014. | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Dismissing Case with Prejudice With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6) filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC on 05/05/2014. | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith. | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith. | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other (for entry of judgment in event of default in payment plan and stipulation to dismiss with prejudice with the court retaining jurisdiction to enforce settlement) filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC; Hales Engineering Co Inc on 04/23/2014. | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (serve Roy A Hales agent for service) filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC on 03/28/2014. | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Dismissal to be filed by Oct 28.2014) filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC on 03/05/2014. | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PRAXAIR DISTRIBUTION INC on 12/27/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.