Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Dylan R, against Davis, Charles W, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1338 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Fully Satisfied) filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 08/25/2017. | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 02/28/2017. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (interest and evidence code 1550) filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 10/15/2014. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Davis, Charles W on Complaint. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Attachment - Other (Exhibits in support of Judgment) filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 10/15/2014. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 10/15/2014. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Asset Acceptance LLC against Davis, Charles W in the amount of: 11838.70 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 435.00 costs, 2423.52 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 10/15/2014. | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 10/15/2014. | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (former atty Fulton Friedman & Gullace LLp new atty Dylan Williams) filed by Asset Acceptance LLC on 03/05/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.