Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Autovest Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Boulanger, Michael R., against Kwong, Edward, Mcgee, Joan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J. Sabo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | re: disposition of defendant McGee | ||
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal heard 08/27/2019 08:15:00 AM. | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal - re: disposition of defendant McGee scheduled for 08/27/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Autovest LLC on 01/12/2016. | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Default vacated as to McGee, Joan on Complaint. | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposition for Autovest LLC on Complaint vacated. | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Disposition for McGee, Joan on Complaint vacated. | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Granting Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment) filed by Autovest LLC; McGee, Joan on 08/03/2015. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.