Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rsl Funding Llc, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time474 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
February 05, 2014 | |||
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition - Other has been Granted. | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Unopposed Order on Petition for Approval of Transfer of sTructured Settlement Payment Rights) filed by RSL Funding LLC on 02/05/2014. | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Proposed Unopposed Order on Petition for Approval of Transfer of sTructured Settlement Payment Rights forwarde to Judge Cody) received from RSL Funding LLC on 02/03/2014 | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (of Notice and Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement) filed by RSL Funding LLC on 01/07/2014. | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payments Rights) filed by RSL Funding LLC on 01/07/2014. | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition - Other - scheduled for 02/05/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.