Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Parks, Josephine, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Marcus, Gerald L., against Ean Holdings Llc, Ean Holdings, Chandrasekaran, Balaji Pradeep, represented by Boyd, Kurt, Charboneau, Robert B., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial204 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions602 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time602 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
June 01, 2015 |
(time estimate 6 days)
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
April 15, 2015 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 04/15/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Parks, Josephine on 04/13/2015. | |
April 10, 2015 |
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) heard 04/10/2015 08:30:00 AM. | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) - scheduled for 04/10/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account (forwarded to file) received from Parks, Dean on 02/24/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.