Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gregory, Carly, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Campbell, Glenn J, against Moustapha Abou Samra Md, Moustapha Abou Samra Md A Professional Corporation, Sean X Xie Md, Ventura County Neurosurgical Associates Medical Group, represented by Brandmeyer, Kent T, Coats, Benjamin F., Hennessey, Maureen K, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions496 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1526 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Filed by Defendant Sean X Xie MD scheduled for 03/07/2018 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated. | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Taking Deft Sean Xie, MD's petition to confirm arbitration award off calendar) filed by Sean X Xie MD on 03/06/2018. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition - Other has been Dismissed. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gregory, Carly on 03/01/2018. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition - Other has been Granted. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition - Other (to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award) filed by Gregory, Carly on 02/26/2018. Filed By: Gregory, Carly(Plaintiff) | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection (to Plaintiff's Certificate RE: Disqualification of Judgment (CCP 170.6)) filed by Sean X Xie MD on 02/23/2018. | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Filed by Defendant Sean X Xie MD scheduled for 03/07/2018 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura. | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 02/22/2018 01:48:00 PM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.