Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Green, Ronald J., against Gonzales, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2058 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 60.00, Credit to Interest 580.20, Credit to Principal 0.00, Interest 2076.23) filed by Lobel Financial Corp on 08/20/2019. | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 08/20/2019. | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Lobel Financial Corp on 08/09/2019. | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 12/31/2018. | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Lobel Financial Corp on 01/02/2015. | |
June 02, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/02/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Lobel Financial Corp on 04/11/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.