Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chehada, Issa, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Ain, Farris E, against Medaa, Medaa, Maida, Nadim, Maida, Mike, Clarks Liquor &Amp; Jr Market, Clarks Liquor & Jr Market, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryOther Employment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions189 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/16/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chehada, Issa on 07/08/2014. | |
May 30, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order - Other (to Continue Case Management Conference Declaration of Farris E Ain) filed by Chehada, Issa on 05/21/2014. | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/16/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Chehada, Issa on 12/31/2013. Filed By: Chehada, Issa(Plaintiff) Refers To: Maida, Mike(Defendant) | Medaa, Medaa(Defendant) | Maida, Nadim(Defendant) | Clarks Liquor & Jr Market(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.