Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ocean Blue Financial Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roberts, Larry M., against Aguilar, Cristina, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ocean Blue Financial Inc on 08/12/2014. | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 28, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing submitted by Aguilar, Cristina rejected on 03/05/2014. | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/28/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing (9.14.bk.10282PC) filed by Aguilar, Cristina on 02/26/2014. | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Stay) filed by Aguilar, Cristina on 02/26/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.