Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fidelity Creditor Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dix, Lloyd Douglas, against Perez, Arnold A., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time480 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by Perez, Arnold A. rejected on 07/03/2014. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
May 28, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 05/28/2014 08:15:00 AM. | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.