Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pierle, Jeanne Marie, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time602 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Final Discharge filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 08/25/2015. | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Approving (Amended First Account and Report of Administrator and For Distribution and Payment of Fees and Costs of Administration) filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 06/30/2015. | |
June 25, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
The property on hand schedule of the amended account ($319,551.84) does not match the corrected inventory/appraisal filed June 5, 2015 ($333,313.66). How was the $4807.43 requested as reimbursement in...
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
June 25, 2015 | First Annual Report of Administrator and Attorneys; Request for Order Re: Creditor's Claim of Tania ... | ||
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) heard 06/25/2015 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Errata (Re Amended First and Final Account and Report of Administrator, Request for Fees and Final Distribution) filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 06/22/2015. | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal (Amended Final Corrected Property Tax Certificate with attachment) filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 06/22/2015. | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of service (AMENDED) (Final Inventory and Appraisal and First and Final Account) filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 06/15/2015. | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Amended (Amended First and Final Account and Report of Administrator, Requesst for Fees and Final Distribution; Verification) filed by Pierle, Jeanne Marie on 06/11/2015. Filed By: Pierle, Jeanne Marie(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.