Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Prime Group Llc Successor In Interest To Paz Mar Select, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kremling-Calabrese, Karen, against Flores, Trinidad, Flores, Juan, Cassian, Blanca, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions32 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1812 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (fully satisfied) filed by Prime Group LLC successor in interest to Paz Mar Select on 03/12/2014. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Applicaiton setting Aside Default, Vacate Judgment and Recall Writ of Execution | ||
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/30/2014 08:15:00 AM. | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Denied) filed by Flores, Trinidad on 01/29/2014. | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Flores, Trinidad Application for Waiver denied in whole. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.