Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris, Stelios A, against Romero, Dolores, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Expired) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/22/2020. | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/05/2020. | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 11/15/2019. | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 10/09/2019. | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (costs $0.00; Credit to Accured Interest $184.46; Credit to Principal $0.00; Accured Interest $1156.57) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 10/09/2019. | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 0.00 Credit 184.46 Interest 289.45) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/06/2017. | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/06/2017. | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 01/09/2015. | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Romero, Dolores on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 (Affidavit) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 01/27/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.