Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ignacio, Manuel E, against Holguin, Edward, Holguin, Melody, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions141 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time534 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 11/07/2014. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA on 03/21/2014. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA on 03/21/2014. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Clerks Judgment) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA on 03/21/2014. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Holguin, Melody on Complaint. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Holguin, Edward on Complaint. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (of Judgment) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA on 03/21/2014. | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA on 03/21/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.