Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jensen, Casey M, against Aloni, Adina, Aloni, Doron, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1750 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1752 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank on 08/17/2018. | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (without satisfaction) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 03/01/2017. | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (dismissal to be filed by Oct 9. 2021) filed by Discover Bank on 04/04/2014. | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Adina Aloni, co-occupant) filed by Discover Bank on 11/27/2013. | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Discover Bank on 11/27/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.