Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Freed, Kenneth J., against 4Th Way Fulfillment Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time963 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 12/26/2013. | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Mayra Salas, person in charge) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 11/18/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/30/2013. Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: 4th Way Fulfillment LLC(Defendant) | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.