Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seneca One Llc, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order (approving transfer of structured settlement payment rights) filed by Seneca One LLC on 12/30/2013. | |
December 12, 2013 |
For Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Approving (Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed by Seneca One LLC on 12/12/2013. | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition - Other has been Granted. | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (of notice of hearing on petition for approval of transfer of structured settlement payment rights with exhibits one through seven) filed by Seneca One LLC on 11/18/2013. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement payment rights) filed by Seneca One LLC on 11/18/2013. | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition - Other - For Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights scheduled for 12/12/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition - Other (For Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed by Seneca One LLC on 10/31/2013. Filed By: Seneca One LLC(Petitioner) Refers To: Flores, Javier(Interested Party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.