Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mount Clef Apartments, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schneberg, William G., against Dalton, Breanne Rose, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions33 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1865 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Fully Satisfied) filed by Mount Clef Apartments on 02/03/2014. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) (and mailing; prejudgment claim of right to possession) filed by Mount Clef Apartments on 12/03/2013. | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for Mount Clef Apartments against Dalton, Breanne Rose in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 12/03/2013. | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerk's judgment) filed by Mount Clef Apartments on 12/03/2013. | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Dalton, Breanne Rose on Complaint. | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Mount Clef Apartments on 12/03/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.